Find Tuition/Enrichment Centres

AskQ logo

STUCK ON HOMEWORK?

ASK FOR HELP FROM OUR KIASUPARENTS.COM COMMUNITY!

Question

Answer

21i) 2704 = 24 × 132

ii) 2704 = 24 × 132
= 22 × 22 x 132
= (2 × 2 × 13)2
= 522

iii) In order for (24 × 132 × m/n) to be a perfect cube, we need to take away one “2” and add one more “13”. So it becomes:

(24 × 132 (13/2)
= 23 × 133
= (2 × 13)3
= 263

This means that m/n is 13/2. So m = 13 and n = 2.

0 Replies 1 Like ✔Accepted Answer
Find Tuition/Enrichment Centres